Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1766 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19569 Week
» 72585 Month
» 192112 Year
» 3218965 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6788 |
14/01/1963 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37088 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/3 (1)) |
37323 |
23/07/1986 |
|
TOPS (37/0 (R)) |
37088 |
18/09/1989 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
3215/8334 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Clayton RO2500/03 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Boxes Nose end Gangway |
|
To Service |
14/01/1963 to Gateshead (52A) |
Withdrawn |
30/09/2002 |
Time in Service |
39 yrs, 8 mths , 16 dys |
Cut Up |
03/10/2002 |
Cut At |
C F Booth (Rotherham) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
14/01/1963 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 04/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/08/1977 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/01/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
10/08/1977 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/01/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6788 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3215 Allocated to Gateshead (52A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
16/07/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
25/02/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
04/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37088 |
|
|
10/08/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
23/07/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37323 |
|
|
18/09/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37088 |
|
|
30/09/2002 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37088 |
|
|
03/10/2002 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|