Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1496 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14902 Week
» 67918 Month
» 187445 Year
» 3214298 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6789 |
18/01/1963 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37089 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/7) |
37708 |
1985 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
3216/8335 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Clayton RO2500/03 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Boxes Nose end Gangway |
|
To Service |
18/01/1963 to Gateshead (52A) |
Withdrawn |
01/10/2002 |
Time in Service |
39 yrs, 8 mths , 13 dys |
Cut Up |
03/2008 |
Cut At |
C F Booth (Rotherham) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
18/01/1963 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
18/07/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/01/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
18/07/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/01/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6789 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3216 Allocated to Gateshead (52A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
16/07/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
25/02/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
18/07/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37089 |
|
|
16/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
1985 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37708 |
|
|
01/10/2002 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37708 |
|
|
03/2008 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|