Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1525 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19328 Week
» 72344 Month
» 191871 Year
» 3218724 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6790 |
28/01/1963 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37090 |
05/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/5) |
37508 |
1985 |
|
TOPS (37/6) |
37606 |
1995 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
3217/8336 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Clayton RO2500/03 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Boxes Nose end Gangway |
|
To Service |
28/01/1963 to Gateshead (52A) |
Status |
In Service |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
28/01/1963 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/01/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/01/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6790 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3217 Allocated to Gateshead (52A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
16/07/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
25/02/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37090 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
12/07/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
02/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (HM) |
|
|
03/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
1985 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37508 |
|
|
1995 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37606 |
|
|