Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1627 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19430 Week
» 72446 Month
» 191973 Year
» 3218826 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6791 |
31/01/1963 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37091 |
26/01/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/3 (2)) |
37358 |
10/03/1988 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
3218/8337 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Clayton RO2500/03 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Boxes Nose end Gangway |
|
To Service |
31/01/1963 to Gateshead (52A) |
Withdrawn |
01/03/1997 |
Time in Service |
34 yrs, 1 mth , -2 dys |
Cut Up |
05/2007 |
Cut At |
T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
31/01/1963 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
26/07/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/1982 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
31/01/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
26/07/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
12/1982 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/01/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6791 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3218 Allocated to Gateshead (52A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
05/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
26/07/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
31/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
26/01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37091 |
|
|
16/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
01/11/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
12/1982 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
10/03/1988 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37358 |
|
|
01/03/1997 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37358 |
|
|
05/2007 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton |
|
|