27/02/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6794 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3221 Allocated to Gateshead (52A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
27/04/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
21/09/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
11/04/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
05/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
11/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
06/01/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
10/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (55C) |
|
|
24/11/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37094 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
06/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
02/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (HM) |
|
|
11/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
12/1988 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37716 |
|
|