Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 328 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18131 Week
» 71147 Month
» 190674 Year
» 3217527 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6796 |
30/11/1962 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37096 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Clayton RO2500/03 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Boxes Nose end Gangway |
|
To Service |
30/11/1962 to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
Withdrawn |
27/02/1991 |
Time in Service |
28 yrs, 2 mths , 28 dys |
Cut Up |
17/09/1991 |
Cut At |
MC Metals (Springburn) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
30/11/1962 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 08/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 07/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
31/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1976 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
27/03/1977 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
12/1978 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/1978 |
|
EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
|
|
12/1978 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/11/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
31/12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 12/1976 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
27/03/1977 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
12/1978 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
dX |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/11/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6796 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
12/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To North Eastern Region (91N) |
|
|
27/01/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
31/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
07/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
11/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37096 |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (HM) |
|
|
04/01/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
12/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
03/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
27/03/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
12/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
12/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
17/02/1979 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (HM) |
|
|
27/02/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37096 |
|
|
17/09/1991 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|