Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 3631 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17037 Week
» 70053 Month
» 189580 Year
» 3216433 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6799 |
14/12/1962 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37099 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/3 (1)) |
37324 |
27/07/1986 |
|
TOPS (37/0 (R)) |
37099 |
19/09/1989 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Clayton RO2500/03 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Boxes Nose end Gangway |
|
To Service |
14/12/1962 to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
Withdrawn |
17/06/1997 |
Time in Service |
34 yrs, 6 mths , 3 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
14/12/1962 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 11/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
28/07/1978 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
16/08/1981 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/12/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
28/07/1978 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
16/08/1981 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/12/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6799 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To North Eastern Region (91N) |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
11/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
11/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37099 |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
28/07/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
16/08/1981 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
06/09/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
01/11/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
27/07/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37324 |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (IS) |
|
|
19/09/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37099 |
|
|
17/06/1997 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37099 |
|
|