Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 776 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14182 Week
» 67198 Month
» 186725 Year
» 3213578 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D68 |
05/10/1960 |
|
TOPS (45/0) |
45046 |
02/1975 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
45 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Box No Gangway |
|
To Service |
05/10/1960 to Crewe North (5A) |
Withdrawn |
02/08/1988 |
Time in Service |
27 yrs, 9 mths , 28 dys |
Cut Up |
12/02/1992 |
Cut At |
MC Metals (Springburn) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1968 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 03/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
03/1979 |
|
Complete headcode assembly removed and replaced by two marker lights. |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/10/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 03/1970 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
03/09/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
08/09/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/10/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D68 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
19/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
03/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
17/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
08/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
15/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
09/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
30/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
21/01/1967 |
Naming |
Named 'ROYAL FUSILIER' at Derby Works |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
03/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CW) |
|
|
02/1975 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45046 |
|
|
03/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Complete headcode assembly removed and replaced by two marker lights. |
|
|
02/08/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45046 |
|
|
12/02/1992 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|