Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 475 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19386 Week
» 84340 Month
» 287004 Year
» 3313857 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6803 |
09/01/1963 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37103 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/5) |
37511 |
1985 |
|
TOPS (37/6) |
37607 |
1995 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Clayton RO2500/03 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Boxes Nose end Gangway |
|
To Service |
09/01/1963 to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
Cut Up |
on |
Status |
In Service |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
09/01/1963 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
14/07/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
04/1977 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 01/1979 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/01/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
14/07/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
04/1977 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/01/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6803 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
14/07/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37103 |
|
|
16/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
04/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
01/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
01/11/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
1985 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37511 |
|
|
1995 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37607 |
|
|