Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 106 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 2552 Week
» 14257 Month
» 345746 Year
» 422333 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
TOPS (Renum) 37108 c. 0
TOPS (Renum) 37325 c. 0
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D6808 25/01/1963
TOPS (37/0) 37108 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 37
Wheels Co-Co
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
To Service 25/01/1963
Withdrawn 01/09/1996
Time in Service 33 yrs, 7 mths , 7 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 25/01/1963
41A Tinsley w/e 02/05/1964
   Withdrawn 01/09/1996

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
0000 Renumbered Renumbered to 37108    
0000 Renumbered Renumbered to 37325    
25/01/1963 Sightings Released from English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number EE/VF3237/D762 1962 As D6808    
25/01/1963 To Service To service as D6808
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
12/04/1964 Sightings Stabled on Retford    
02/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
18/08/1964 Sightings Passed through Doncaster on a Local Coal Working    
10/1971 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 37108    
06/04/1973 Sightings 1505 St. Pancras - Sheffield    
24/06/1973 Sightings Barnsley - Blackpool excursion    
19/08/1976 Sightings 1840 Scarborough - Sheffield    
21/08/1976 Sightings Seen passing through Rotherwood (1M46)    
21/08/1976 Sightings Stabled on Tinsley (TI)    
01/05/1977 Sightings Stabled on Tinsley (TI)    
28/05/1977 Sightings 0745 Sheffield - Bridlington    
16/07/1977 Sightings 0928 Sheffield - Blackpool (1M06)    
16/07/1977 Sightings 1400 Blackpool - Sheffield (1E57)    
20/08/1977 Sightings 1035 Portsmouth - Sheffield Between Nottingham - Sheffield (1E12)    
02/09/1977 Sightings Stabled on Saltley depot    
28/03/1978 Sightings Stabled on Eastfield    
30/03/1978 Sightings 2245 Carstairs - Edinburgh    
26/05/1978 Sightings 0700 Mallaig - Glasgow Queen Street    
26/05/1978 Sightings 1638 Glasgow Queen Street - Fort Wiliam    
27/05/1978 Sightings 1638 Glasgow Queen Street - Malaig Between Glasgow Queen Street - Fort William    
29/05/1978 Sightings 0840 Fort William - Glasgow Queen Street (1T24)    
07/06/1978 Sightings 1638 Glasgow Queen Street - Mallaig    
03/07/1978 Sightings 1515 Fort William - Glasgow Queen Street    
17/03/1979 Sightings Edinburgh - Plymouth Between York - Bristol TM (1V93)    
15/04/1979 Sightings Stabled on Eastfield    
22/08/1980 Sightings 2020 Stirling - Dover Between Stirling - Mossend (1O92)    
15/09/1980 Sightings 0844 Glasgow Queen Street - Dundee (2L31)    
15/09/1980 Sightings 1139 Dundee - Glasgow Queen Street (2T25)    
15/11/1980 Sightings 0844 Glasgow Queen Street - Dundee (2L31)    
15/11/1980 Sightings 1139 Dundee - Glasgow Queen Street (2T25)    
17/04/1981 Sightings 0600 Glasgow Q St - Mallaig Between Glasgow Queen Street - Ft William (1B07)    
11/05/1981 Sightings Fort William - Glasgow Queen Street    
11/05/1981 Sightings Glasgow Queen Street - Fort William    
23/05/1981 Sightings 1635 Glasgow Queen Street - Mallaig Between Glasgow Queen Street - Fort William (1B14)    
30/05/1981 Sightings 0844 Glasgow Queen Street - Dundee (2L31)    
08/06/1981 Sightings 0758 Oban - Glasgow Queen Street (1T16)    
08/06/1981 Sightings 1254 Glasgow Queen Street - Oban (1B11)    
08/06/1981 Sightings 1758 Oban - Glasgow Queen Street (1T51)    
15/07/1981 Sightings 1644 Glasgow Queen Street - Dundee (2L53)    
15/07/1981 Sightings 1939 Dundee - Glasgow Queen Street (2T53)    
13/02/1982 Sightings 0700 Mallaig - Glasgow Qsreet Between Mallaig - Corrour & Failed. (1T24)    
06/03/1982 Sightings 0640 Glasgow Queen Street - Dundee (2L27)    
06/03/1982 Sightings 0939 Dundee - Glasgow Queen Street (2T17)    
06/03/1982 Sightings 1823 Glasgow Queen Street - Oban (1B15)    
27/03/1982 Sightings 0600 Glasgow - Mallaig Between Glasgow - Fort William (1B07)    
27/03/1982 Sightings 1230 Mallaig - Fort William (1B16)    
27/03/1982 Sightings 1630 Fort William - Mallaig (2B12)    
12/04/1982 Sightings 0700 Mallaig - Glasgow Queen Street (1T24)    
15/04/1982 Sightings 0600 Glasgow - Mallaig (1B07)    
28/07/1982 Sightings 0804 Glasgow - Oban (1B08)    
28/07/1982 Sightings 1225 Oban - Glasgow (1T32)    
28/07/1982 Sightings 1823 Glasgow Queen Street - Oban (1B15)    
31/07/1982 Sightings 1638 Glasgow Queen Street - Dundee (2L53)    
31/07/1982 Sightings 1903 Dundee - Glasgow Queen Street (2T51)    
27/08/1982 Sightings 1634 Glasgow Queen Street - Mallaig Between Glasgow - Fort William (1B14)    
25/09/1982 Sightings LNER Society railtour over West Highland Line With 37081 (37797)    
04/12/1982 Sightings 0600 Glasgow - Mallaig (1B07)    
18/12/1982 Sightings 1610 Mallaig - Glasgow Queen Street Between Fort William - Glasgow Queen Street (1T56)    
19/03/1983 Sightings 0435 Edinburgh - Glasgow Queen Street (1T03)    
23/03/1983 Sightings 0600 Glasgow - Mallaig Between ? -? (1B07)    
30/03/1983 Sightings 2055 Euston - Fort William Glasgow Queen Street shunt, attach to 1B07. (1T02)    
30/03/1983 Sightings 2055 Euston - Mallaig Between Between Mossend - Cowlairs (1T02)    
04/04/1983 Sightings 0804 Glasgow Queen Street - Oban (1B08)    
04/04/1983 Sightings 1225 Oban - Glasgow Queen Street (1T32)    
04/04/1983 Sightings 1823 Glasgow Queen Street - Oban (1B15)    
05/04/1983 Sightings 0754 Oban - Glasgow Queen Street (1T16)    
05/04/1983 Sightings 1255 Glasgow Queen Street - Oban (1B11)    
16/04/1983 Sightings 1704 Queens Park - Aberdeen (1Z48)    
23/04/1983 Sightings 0600 Glasgow Queen Street - Mallaig (1B07)    
28/04/1983 Sightings 0740 Oban - Glasgow Queen Street (1T16)    
30/04/1983 Sightings +1Z54 1130 Footex Dundee - Cartsdyke And Return, Via Lenzie, Springburn And Shields Jn (1Z53)    
21/05/1983 Sightings 1823 Glasgow Queen Street - Oban (1B15)    
04/07/1983 Sightings 1610 Mallaig - Glasgow Queen Street (1T56)    
07/07/1983 Sightings 0740 Oban - Glasgow Queen Street (1T16)    
08/07/1983 Sightings 1255 Glasgow Queen Street - Oban (1B11)    
08/07/1983 Sightings 1758 Oban - Glasgow Queen Street (1T52)    
19/07/1983 Sightings 0600 Glasgow Queen Street - Mallaig (1B07)    
19/07/1983 Sightings 1225 Mallaig - Glasgow Queen Street Between Mallaig - Fort William (1B16)    
01/08/1983 Sightings 0600 Glasgow Queen Street - Mallaig With 37192 (37694) (1B07)    
10/08/1983 Sightings 0435 Edinburgh - Glasgow Queen Street (1T03)    
10/08/1983 Sightings 0805 Glasgow Queen Street - Oban (1B08)    
10/08/1983 Sightings 1225 Oban - Glasgow Queen Street (1T26)    
11/08/1983 Sightings 0740 Oban - Glasgow Queen Street (1T16)    
12/08/1983 Sightings 2350 Inverness - Glasgow Queen Street (1T04)    
15/09/1983 Sightings 1823 Glasgow Queen Street - Oban (1B15)    
15/09/1983 Sightings 2100 Euston - Fort William Between Mossend - Cowlairs (1S06)    
18/09/1983 Sightings 0905 Edinburgh - Oban (1Z19)    
18/09/1983 Sightings 1530 Oban - Edinburgh (1Z19)    
19/09/1983 Sightings 2100 Euston - Fort William Between Cowlairs - Glasgow Queen Street (1S06)    
26/09/1983 Sightings 0600 Glasgow Queen Street - Mallaig With 37085 (37711) (1B07)    
14/02/1984 Sightings 0840 Fort William - Glasgow Queen Street (1T24)    
18/02/1984 Sightings 1220 Glasgow Queen Street - Oban (1B11)    
22/05/1984 Sightings 1800 Oban - Glasgow Queen Street (1T52)    
24/05/1984 Sightings Fort William - Mallaig    
24/05/1984 Sightings Mallaig - Fort William    
24/05/1984 Sightings Stabled on Fort William    
29/05/1984 Sightings 1850 Mallaig - Fort William (2B18)    
29/05/1984 Sightings Stabled on Fort William    
01/06/1984 Sightings 0840 Fort William - Glasgow Queen Street With 37192 (37694) (1T24)    
28/08/1984 Sightings 1220 Glasgow Queen Street - Oban (1B11)    
28/08/1984 Sightings 1800 Oban - Glasgow Queen Street (1T52)    
13/10/1984 Sightings 1638 Glasgow Queen Street - Dundee (2L53)    
19/10/1984 Sightings 2100 Euston - Fort William Between Cowlairs - Glasgow Queen Street (1S07)    
12/03/1985 Sightings Arpley - Healey Mills    
08/04/1985 Sightings 1820 Glasgow Queen Street - Oban (1B15)    
09/04/1985 Sightings 0800 Oban - Glasgow Queen Street (1T16)    
11/04/1985 Sightings 1715 Glasgow Queen Street - Edinburgh (2O49)    
13/04/1985 Sightings 1220 Glasgow Queen Street - Oban (1B11)    
20/04/1985 Sightings 0800 Oban - Glasgow Queen Street (1T16)    
08/07/1985 Sightings 1800 Oban - Glasgow Queen Street (1T44)    
10/07/1985 Sightings 1550 Mallaig - Euston Between Fort William - Glasgow Queen Street (1M16)    
15/07/1985 Sightings 0800 Oban - Glasgow Queen Street (1T12)    
16/08/1985 Sightings 1650 Glasgow Queen Street - Fort William (1Y23)    
17/08/1985 Sightings 1742 Fort William - Euston Between Fort William - Glasgow Queen Street (1M16)    
21/08/1985 Sightings 0650 Mallaig - Fort William (2Y52)    
20/12/1985 Sightings Working on Crewe Works Test Train to/from Llandudno    
02/01/1986 Sightings Working on Crewe Works Test Train to/from Llandudno    
10/01/1986 Sightings Working on Crewe Works Test Train to/from Llandudno Junc    
23/01/1986 Sightings Working on Crewe Works Test Train to/from Llandudno Junc    
28/01/1986 Sightings On light engine Test to Llandudno Junc    
04/02/1986 Sightings Working on Crewe Works Test Train to/from Rhyl    
09/05/1986 Sightings Doncaster - Gartcosh Speedlink (6S46)    
27/07/1986 Sightings 1610 Glasgow Central - Euston Between Carstairs - Beattock (1M46)    
27/07/1986 Sightings 1710 Glasgow - Euston Between Carstairs - Beatock summit (1M52)    
24/10/1988 Sightings 2100 Euston - Fort William Rear assist over Beattock With 37311 (37156) (1S07)    
09/07/1990 Sightings Working Hunterston - BSc Ravenscraig iron ore train through Holytown With 37026 + 37040    
16/06/1992 Sightings 1714 Manchester V - Blackpool (1N97)    
16/06/1992 Sightings 1857 Blackpool - Liverpool Lime Street Between Blackpool - Wigan NW (2F38)    
17/06/1992 Sightings 0650 Blackpool - Liverpool Lime Street (2F32)    
17/06/1992 Sightings 1037 Liverpool - Blackpool (2N49)    
17/06/1992 Sightings 1325 Blackpool - Liverpool Lime Street (2F32)    
02/10/1993 Sightings 0520 Preston - Cwmgwarch Between Preston - Kidwelly Loop With 37068 (1Z16)    
03/10/1993 Sightings 2020 Inverness - Euston Between Preston - Stockport With 37068 (1M16)    
01/12/1993 Sightings 0600 Paddington - Glasgow Central Between Heyford - Birmingham NS    
13/05/1994 Sightings 1400 Holyhead - Crewe Between Penmaenmawr - Llandudno Jn dragging 37425 DIT (1K64)    
26/08/1994 Sightings On ballast at Penmaenmawr With 37683    
09/08/1995 Sightings Glasgow Central - Euston Between Penrith - Preston (1M18)    
19/04/1996 Sightings 2138 Crewe - Cardiff Between Leominster - Cardiff (1V92)    
04/07/1996 Sightings 0905 Birmingham - Glasgow Between Shap - Carlisle (1S48)    
01/09/1996 Withdrawn Condemned as 37108    

prev prev