Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 840 Today
» 1058 Yesterday
» 5414 Week
» 33372 Month
» 68014 Year
» 1289579 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 6809 m/e 09/1936

Names Carried
Date From Name
09/1936 BURGHCLERE GRANGE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Grange
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 09/1936
Withdrawal During 07/1963
Scrapping During 08/1963
Service Life 26 yrs, 9 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 25/01/1958
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 22/02/1958
81C Southall 4w/e 06/10/1962
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC PZ Penzance 4w/e 28/01/1950
ALLOC 86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 28/12/1957
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 22/02/1958
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 06/10/1962
WDN   4w/e 29/06/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1936 To Service To service as GWR Number 6809, name: BURGHCLERE GRANGE
Built at Swindon Works
   
25/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G)    
22/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
06/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
07/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 6809    

prev prev