Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1413 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14819 Week
» 67835 Month
» 187362 Year
» 3214215 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6813 |
15/02/1963 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37113 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
15/02/1963 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 05/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 05/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
01/1971 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
27/02/1971 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler drained |
|
|
|
|
by 11/1975 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
20/02/1977 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/02/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
01/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
27/02/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 03/1973 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 11/1975 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
20/02/1977 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/02/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6813 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
05/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
01/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
27/02/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
03/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler drained |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37113 |
|
|
16/02/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
11/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
20/02/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
03/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
08/1995 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: at Portobello Yard, Edinburgh |
|
|
14/09/1995 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37113 |
|
|