Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 4093 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13667 Week
» 78621 Month
» 281285 Year
» 3308138 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6817 |
06/03/1963 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37117 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/5) |
37521 |
15/04/1988 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
Class | From | 37 | 06/03/1963 | 37/5 | 15/04/1988 |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Clayton RO2500/03 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Boxes Nose end Gangway |
|
To Service |
06/03/1963 to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
Status |
In Service |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
06/03/1963 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
27/03/1971 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 04/1975 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 11/1975 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1980 |
|
Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
06/03/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
27/03/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 04/1975 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 11/1975 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 06/1980 |
vot |
Vacuum brakes, No heat, Extended Fuel Tanks |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/03/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6817 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
09/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
27/03/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37117 |
|
|
16/02/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
04/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
11/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
06/1980 |
Modification |
Modification: Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|
15/04/1988 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37521 |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|