Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2934 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16340 Week
» 69356 Month
» 188883 Year
» 3215736 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6818 |
15/03/1963 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37118 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/3 (2)) |
37359 |
02/11/1988 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
15/03/1963 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
17/06/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/03/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
17/06/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/03/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6818 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
09/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
17/06/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37118 |
|
|
09/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
02/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
02/11/1988 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37359 |
|
|
01/11/1994 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37359 |
|
|
01/2005 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Carnforth |
|
|