Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 126 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17929 Week
» 70945 Month
» 190472 Year
» 3217325 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6823 |
25/04/1963 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37123 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/5) |
37679 |
1986 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
25/04/1963 to Cardiff Canton (88A) |
Withdrawn |
01/12/2000 |
Time in Service |
37 yrs, 7 mths , 6 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
25/04/1963 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
08/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1974 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/04/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
08/1968 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/04/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6823 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Cardiff Canton (88A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
01/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
19/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To North Eastern Region (91N) |
|
|
16/07/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
16/07/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
09/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
08/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37123 |
|
|
12/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37679 |
|
|
01/12/2000 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37679 |
|
|