Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 5403 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 21015 Week
» 119660 Month
» 322324 Year
» 3349177 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6824 |
29/04/1963 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37124 |
04/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/7) |
37894 |
1985 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
29/04/1963 to Cardiff Canton (88A) |
Withdrawn |
01/10/2000 |
Time in Service |
37 yrs, 5 mths , 2 dys |
Cut Up |
m/e 08/2008 |
Cut At |
EMR (Kingsbury) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
29/04/1963 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
28/09/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/04/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
28/09/1968 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/04/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6824 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Cardiff Canton (88A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
19/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To North Eastern Region (91N) |
|
|
16/07/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
16/07/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
28/09/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
16/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37124 |
|
|
1985 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37894 |
|
|
01/10/2000 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37894 |
|
|
08/2008 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by EMR: Kingsbury |
|
|