Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2285 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20088 Week
» 73104 Month
» 192631 Year
» 3219484 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6833 |
05/04/1963 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37133 |
05/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
05/04/1963 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 07/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
23/03/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/04/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
23/03/1971 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/04/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6833 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Cardiff Canton (88A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
01/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
30/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (56B) |
|
|
02/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
23/03/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
07/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
19/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37133 |
|
|
31/10/2004 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37133 |
|
|
30/11/2004 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Carnforth |
|
|