Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 2178 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19981 Week
» 72997 Month
» 192524 Year
» 3219377 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6834 |
10/04/1963 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37134 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/5) |
37684 |
1986 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
10/04/1963 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 08/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
03/03/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
03/1979 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
10/04/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
03/03/1969 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/04/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6834 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Cardiff Canton (88A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
30/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To North Eastern Region (91N) |
|
|
28/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (56B) |
|
|
02/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
03/03/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
05/04/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
08/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37134 |
|
|
03/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
07/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37684 |
|
|