Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 779 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18582 Week
» 71598 Month
» 191125 Year
» 3217978 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6835 |
10/04/1963 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37135 |
05/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/7) |
37888 |
1985 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
10/04/1963 to Cardiff Canton (88A) |
Status |
In Service |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
10/04/1963 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
19/11/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1974 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
10/04/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
19/11/1968 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/04/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6835 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Cardiff Canton (88A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
30/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To North Eastern Region (91N) |
|
|
03/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
19/11/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (55C) |
|
|
11/07/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
06/11/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
18/12/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
23/02/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
09/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37135 |
|
|
12/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
07/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
1985 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37888 |
|
|