Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 895 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 24526 Week
» 89480 Month
» 292144 Year
» 3318997 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
6836 |
on |
02/09/1937 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
Grange |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
308 |
To Service |
Fri 02/09/1937 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 06/08/1965 |
Service Life |
27 yrs, 11 mths , 4 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/09/1937 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 6836, name: ESTEVARNEY GRANGE Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Philips Marsh (SPM) |
|
|
13/08/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (WEY) |
|
|
05/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (SPM) |
|
|
16/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Penzance (83G) |
|
|
31/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G) |
|
|
26/12/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Penzance (83G) |
|
|
13/08/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
21/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
04/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G) |
|
|
29/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (85A) |
|
|
21/04/1965 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Worcester (85A) |
|
|
06/08/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6836 |
|
|
10/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|