Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 938 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18741 Week
» 71757 Month
» 191284 Year
» 3218137 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6841 |
10/05/1963 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37141 |
06/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
10/05/1963 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
10/05/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/05/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6841 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Cardiff Canton (88A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
20/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
27/03/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
27/03/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
01/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
11/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
17/11/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|
06/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37141 |
|
|
10/08/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
12/07/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
02/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
26/07/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
01/11/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
31/01/2005 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37141 |
|
|
28/02/2005 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Carnforth |
|
|