Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 519 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2634 Week
» 25140 Month
» 328330 Year
» 1549895 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 6841 on 23/09/1937

Names Carried
Date From Name
23/09/1937 MARLAS GRANGE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Grange
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 308
To Service Thu 23/09/1937
Withdrawal Thu 03/06/1965
Scrapping During 10/1965 at Cohens (Morriston)
Service Life 27 yrs, 8 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 23/09/1937
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 14/06/1958
81C Southall 4w/e 06/10/1962
81F Oxford 4w/e 20/07/1964
   Withdrawn on 03/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 15/07/1950
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 14/06/1958
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 12/07/1958
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 81F Oxford 3w/e 20/07/1964
WDN   on 03/06/1965
WDN   4w/e 13/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1949 Swindon Works New Work April: Nos. *7903 Foremarke Hall (8/4), *7904 Fountains Hall (14/4), 7905 Fowey Hall LA (28/4); 9678 NA (1/4), 9679 CED (11/4), 9680 TYS (22/4), 9681 TDU (29/4). *Not allocated. Nos. 7903- 05 are painted black and fully lined, while Nos. 9678-81 are plain black. Nos. 7018 Cranbrook Castle and 7019 were nearly complete on 9/5 and the frames and cylinders for the first of the 15XX were in position for drilling. No. 4971 TN has been re-converted to coal-burning.
Locomotives entering Works during April included: Nos. 1003/15, 1418/48, 2014 (open cab), 2154 (open cab), 2213/34/65/73, 2812/50/55/61, 2908/12/42/50, 3011, 3666/86, 3737, 3846. 4051/75/88/94, 4138, 4267, 4500, 4663/89, 4805 (for re-conversion), 4908/15/22/41/49/86, 5016/44/54/56/69/74/84/89, 5311/53/60/82, 5523/39/55/74, 5800, 5970/73, 6018/28, 6351/63/67/93, 6812/16/41/48/60, 7236, 7749/53, 8703/43. Condemned: Nos. 47, 1758, 3592 (all to Concentration Yard), No. 277 (acting as Works' pilot). No. 3175 has been cut up in 'A' Shop. Nos. 6100/01/03/59 have had the footsteps set further inwards, to enable them to work on the Reading-Redhill line. No. 155 ex Works, has been fitted with a copper-capped parallel chimney replacing the tapered cast-iron one formerly carried. No. 3033, ex Works, now carries the frames, cylinders and cab sides of No. 3005 (condemned) and the boiler of No. 3033. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include: Nos. 1003, 5931, 6907/33; Nos. 4003/07/49 are painted dark green and fully lined. The contents of the Stock Shed on 3/5 were:-Nos. 2948, 4124/68/69, 4914, 5153, 5411, 5919, 6915/19/97/8/9 an 7902.
SLS/194906

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
23/09/1937 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6841, name: MARLAS GRANGE
Built at Swindon Works
   
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
06/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
20/07/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
03/06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 6841    

prev prev