Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1347 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19150 Week
» 72166 Month
» 191693 Year
» 3218546 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6845 |
06/06/1963 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37145 |
04/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/3 (1)) |
37313 |
06/08/1986 |
|
TOPS (37/0 (R)) |
37145 |
14/09/1989 |
|
TOPS (37/3 (2)) |
37382 |
23/06/1992 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
06/06/1963 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 01/1979 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
06/06/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/06/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6845 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Cardiff Canton (88A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
24/09/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
28/09/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37145 |
|
|
01/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
06/08/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37313 |
|
|
14/09/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37145 |
|
|
23/06/1992 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37382 |
|
|
01/01/1994 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37382 |
|
|
04/2000 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Raxstar: at Immingham MPD |
|
|