Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 1583 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19386 Week
» 72402 Month
» 191929 Year
» 3218782 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6849 |
21/06/1963 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37149 |
09/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/7) |
37892 |
02/10/1987 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
21/06/1963 to Cardiff Canton (88A) |
Withdrawn |
01/01/2000 |
Time in Service |
36 yrs, 6 mths , 11 dys |
Cut Up |
01/2008 |
Cut At |
EMR (Kingsbury) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
21/06/1963 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 09/1975 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/06/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Sightings
Report Date |
Title |
Location |
Report |
Headcode |
Reference |
01/03/1975 |
Eastfield shed visit |
Eastfield |
On shed |
|
Bruce Strong, Facebook |
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/06/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6849 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Cardiff Canton (88A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
24/09/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
26/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
09/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37149 |
|
|
09/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
02/10/1987 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37892 |
|
|
01/01/2000 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37892 |
|
|
01/2008 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by EMR: Kingsbury |
|
|