Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 122 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17925 Week
» 70941 Month
» 190468 Year
» 3217321 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6851 |
02/07/1963 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37151 |
05/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/5) |
37667 |
10/06/1988 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
Class | From | 37 | 02/07/1963 | 37/5 | 10/06/1988 |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
02/07/1963 to Cardiff Canton (88A) |
Status |
In Service |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
02/07/1963 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 09/1975 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
02/07/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/07/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6851 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Cardiff Canton (88A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
24/09/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
31/10/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37151 |
|
|
09/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
10/06/1988 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37667 |
|
|