Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 499 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5100 Week
» 16647 Month
» 416329 Year
» 492916 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
TOPS (Renum) 37152 c. 0
TOPS (Renum) 37310 c. 0
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D6852 08/07/1963
TOPS (37/0) 37152 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 37
Wheels Co-Co
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
To Service 08/07/1963
Withdrawn 01/12/1999
Time in Service 36 yrs, 4 mths , 23 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
87E Landore (New) 08/07/1963
86A Cardiff Canton w/e 15/11/1964
87E Landore 5w/e 01/05/1966
66A Polmadie 4w/e 20/08/1966
65A Eastfield 5w/e 01/04/1972
   Withdrawn 01/12/1999

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
0000 Renumbered Renumbered to 37152    
0000 Renumbered Renumbered to 37310    
08/07/1963 To Service To service as D6852
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Landore (87E)
   
15/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A)    
01/05/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
20/08/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
01/04/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 37152    
01/12/1999 Withdrawn Condemned as 37152    

prev prev