Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2496 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 18108 Week
» 116753 Month
» 319417 Year
» 3346270 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6855 |
18/07/1963 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37155 |
04/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/7) |
37897 |
1985 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
18/07/1963 to Landore (87E) |
Withdrawn |
01/03/2000 |
Time in Service |
36 yrs, 7 mths , 12 dys |
Cut Up |
m/e 02/2008 |
Cut At |
EMR (Kingsbury) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
18/07/1963 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 10/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 09/1975 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/07/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Sightings
Report Date |
Title |
Location |
Report |
Headcode |
Reference |
23/06/1994 |
|
Deepdale branch, Preston |
Noted taking a coal train down the Deepdale branch in Preston. |
|
Gerry Lishman, Facebook |
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/07/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6855 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Landore (87E) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
15/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
01/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
20/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
06/02/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
26/02/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
01/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37155 |
|
|
09/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
1985 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37897 |
|
|
01/03/2000 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37897 |
|
|
02/2008 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by EMR: Kingsbury |
|
|