Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 4364 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17770 Week
» 70786 Month
» 190313 Year
» 3217166 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6857 |
25/07/1963 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37157 |
04/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/5) |
37695 |
1986 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
25/07/1963 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 05/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
11/1971 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 09/1975 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/07/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
03/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
11/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
BR AWS |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/07/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6857 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Cardiff Canton (88A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
20/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
26/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
01/11/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
03/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
05/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
11/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37157 |
|
|
09/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
03/03/1979 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Motherwell (ML) |
|
|
1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37695 |
|
|
01/03/2004 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37695 |
|
|
04/2008 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Ron Hull Jr.: Rotherham |
|
|