Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1853 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15259 Week
» 68275 Month
» 187802 Year
» 3214655 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6863 |
06/08/1963 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37163 |
02/02/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/7) |
37802 |
1985 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
06/08/1963 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 04/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
02/06/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1980 |
|
Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
06/08/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
02/06/1969 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 06/1980 |
xot |
Dual brakes, No heat, Extended Fuel Tanks |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/08/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6863 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Landore (87E) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
03/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (56B) |
|
|
03/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
02/06/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
04/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
11/07/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37163 |
|
|
06/1980 |
Modification |
Modification: Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|
1985 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37802 |
|
|
01/01/2003 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37802 |
|
|
07/2003 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Unknown: at Calatayud, Spain |
|
|