Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 4065 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 22976 Week
» 87930 Month
» 290594 Year
» 3317447 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6866 |
09/09/1963 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37166 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/7) |
37891 |
24/09/1987 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
09/09/1963 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 08/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
07/02/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/09/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
07/02/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/09/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6866 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
31/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (56B) |
|
|
07/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
14/06/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
07/03/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
02/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
19/02/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
10/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37166 |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
26/07/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
01/11/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
24/09/1987 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37891 |
|
|