Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 795 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5396 Week
» 16943 Month
» 416625 Year
» 493212 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D6869 23/08/1963
TOPS (37/0) 37169 01/01/1973
TOPS (37/6a) 37674 1986

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 37
Wheels Co-Co
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
To Service 23/08/1963
Withdrawn 01/01/2005
Time in Service 41 yrs, 4 mths , 9 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
87E Landore (New) 23/08/1963
56B Healey Mills 4w/e 31/12/1966
41A Tinsley 4w/e 11/07/1970
   Withdrawn 01/01/2005

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
23/08/1963 To Service To service as D6869
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Landore (87E)
   
31/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Healey Mills (56B)    
05/1969 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
11/07/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 37169    
1986 Renumbered Renumbered to 37674    
01/01/2005 Withdrawn Condemned as 37674    

prev prev