Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 83 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17886 Week
» 70902 Month
» 190429 Year
» 3217282 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6870 |
30/08/1963 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37170 |
05/1974 |
|
Departmental (Dept) |
97302 |
2007 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
30/08/1963 to Landore (87E) |
Withdrawn |
30/06/2005 |
Time in Service |
41 yrs , 10 mths |
Status |
Awaiting Scrapping |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
30/08/1963 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
02/09/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 10/1975 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/08/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
02/09/1971 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/08/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6870 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Landore (87E) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
31/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (56B) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/09/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37170 |
|
|
10/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
30/06/2005 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37170 |
|
|
2007 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 97302 |
|
|