Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 389 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 389 Week
» 22895 Month
» 326085 Year
» 1547650 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 6875 on 15/04/1939

Names Carried
Date From Name
15/04/1939 HINDFORD GRANGE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Grange
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 308
To Service Tue 15/04/1939
Withdrawal Tue 10/03/1964
Scrapping During 07/1964
Service Life 24 yrs, 10 mths , 24 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 15/04/1939
83B Taunton 4w/e 31/08/1950
83G Penzance 4w/e 25/01/1958
83E St Blazey 4w/e 18/06/1960
83G Penzance 4w/e 04/11/1961
88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 06/10/1962
81C Southall 4w/e 29/06/1963
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 22/02/1964
   Withdrawn on 10/03/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 83B Taunton 4w/e 12/08/1950
ALLOC 83G Penzance 4w/e 28/12/1957
ALLOC 83E St Blazey 4w/e 18/06/1960
ALLOC 83G Penzance 4w/e 04/11/1961
ALLOC CED Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 29/06/1963
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 24/02/1964
WDN   5w/e 30/03/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/12/1962 Cardiff East Dock MPD There is no diesel locomotive whatever here and CED is now a full main line shed for the first time in its life ! This must be unique in railway history and the steam phase is expected to last two years as Canton is being demolished completely to make way for a diesel shed and main diesel depot for S. Wales. On 9th December, 1962, the following were on shed-1613, 2875/97, 3662, 3782/4, 3804/10, 4090, 4242/72/82, 5043/74/81/97, 5220/4/5/9, 5749, 6606/37/81, 6813/32/75/6, 6918/32/45/56/72/7/87/95, 7016, 7913, 8425/97, 9426/37, 9629, 92003/236/44/6. SLS/196302

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
15/04/1939 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6875, name: HINDFORD GRANGE
Built at Swindon Works
   
31/08/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Taunton (83B)    
25/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Penzance (83G)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to St Blazey (83E)    
04/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Penzance (83G)    
06/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88L)    
29/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
22/02/1964 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
10/03/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 6875    

prev prev