Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1022 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18825 Week
» 71841 Month
» 191368 Year
» 3218221 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6876 |
14/10/1963 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37176 |
04/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/7) |
37883 |
06/12/1988 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Clayton RO2500/03 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
14/10/1963 to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
Status |
In Service |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
14/10/1963 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 10/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
05/1970 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
30/05/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/10/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
05/1970 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
30/05/1970 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
by 06/1977 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/10/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6876 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
05/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
05/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
30/05/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37176 |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
06/12/1988 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37883 |
|
|