Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2695 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16101 Week
» 69117 Month
» 188644 Year
» 3215497 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6879 |
02/10/1963 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37179 |
21/12/1973 |
|
TOPS (37/5) |
37691 |
1986 |
|
TOPS (37/6) |
37612 |
1995 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Clayton RO2500/03 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
02/10/1963 to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
Status |
In Service |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
02/10/1963 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 05/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
15/11/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
09/09/1976 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
by 09/1977 |
|
Headlight(s) removed |
|
|
|
|
08/10/1977 |
|
Headlight(s) removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
02/10/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
15/11/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
09/09/1976 |
xbh |
Dual brakes, Steam heat, Headlight |
|
|
|
by 06/1977 |
xbh |
Dual brakes, Steam heat, Headlight |
|
|
|
by 09/1977 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
08/10/1977 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/10/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6879 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
15/11/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
05/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87A) |
|
|
21/12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37179 |
|
|
09/09/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
09/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) removed |
|
|
08/10/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) removed |
|
|
1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37691 |
|
|
1995 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37612 |
|
|