Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 31 Online
» 1616 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 25247 Week
» 90201 Month
» 292865 Year
» 3319718 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6892 |
20/02/1964 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37192 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/5) |
37694 |
1986 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Clayton RO2500/03 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
20/02/1964 to Landore (87E) |
Withdrawn |
01/06/2004 |
Time in Service |
40 yrs, 3 mths , 12 dys |
Cut Up |
m/e 01/2008 |
Cut At |
EMR (Kingsbury) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
20/02/1964 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 03/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
02/1974 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
09/1974 |
|
Headlight(s) removed |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/02/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
05/1970 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
02/1974 |
xbh |
Dual brakes, Steam heat, Headlight |
|
|
|
09/1974 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/1977 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/02/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6892 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Landore (87E) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
15/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
01/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
05/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
02/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37192 |
|
|
09/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) removed |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
01/11/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37694 |
|
|
01/06/2004 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37694 |
|
|
01/2008 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by EMR: Kingsbury |
|
|