Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 3420 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16826 Week
» 69842 Month
» 189369 Year
» 3216222 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6895 |
17/03/1964 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37195 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/5) |
37689 |
18/02/1987 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
17/03/1964 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 03/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
29/11/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1980 |
|
Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/03/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
29/11/1969 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 03/1980 |
xot |
Dual brakes, No heat, Extended Fuel Tanks |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/03/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6895 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Landore (87E) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
28/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
15/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W) |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
29/11/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
31/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
03/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37195 |
|
|
18/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
03/1980 |
Modification |
Modification: Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|
18/02/1987 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37689 |
|
|