Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1151 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14557 Week
» 67573 Month
» 187100 Year
» 3213953 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6902 |
23/10/1963 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37202 |
26/01/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/3 (2)) |
37331 |
02/09/1994 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
23/10/1963 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 08/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 07/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
16/12/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 09/1975 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/10/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
16/12/1969 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/10/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6902 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W) |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
16/12/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
31/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
07/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (55C) |
|
|
12/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
26/01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37202 |
|
|
09/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
03/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
02/09/1994 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37331 |
|
|
01/03/1995 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37331 |
|
|
08/2003 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Barrow Hill |
|
|