Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 4063 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17469 Week
» 70485 Month
» 190012 Year
» 3216865 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6903 |
29/10/1963 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37203 |
05/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
29/10/1963 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 05/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/1971 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
|
|
08/1972 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/10/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
05/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
12/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
BR AWS |
|
|
08/1972 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
Dual AWS/ATC |
|
|
by 06/1977 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
BR AWS |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/10/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6903 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
29/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
06/02/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
05/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
05/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
26/02/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
08/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
05/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
24/11/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37203 |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|