Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 4597 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 23508 Week
» 88462 Month
» 291126 Year
» 3317979 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6904 |
05/11/1963 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37204 |
04/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/3 (2)) |
37378 |
27/05/1988 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
05/11/1963 to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
Withdrawn |
01/05/1996 |
Time in Service |
32 yrs, 5 mths , 26 dys |
Cut Up |
m/e 06/1996 |
Cut At |
C F Booth (Rotherham) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
05/11/1963 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
11/1971 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 09/1975 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/11/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
11/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
BR AWS |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/11/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6904 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
01/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
26/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
11/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
01/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37204 |
|
|
09/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
01/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
27/05/1988 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37378 |
|
|
01/05/1996 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37378 |
|
|
06/1996 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|