Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1927 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15333 Week
» 68349 Month
» 187876 Year
» 3214729 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6908 |
20/11/1963 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37208 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/7) |
37803 |
1985 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
20/11/1963 to Landore (87E) |
Withdrawn |
01/10/2000 |
Time in Service |
36 yrs, 10 mths , 11 dys |
Cut Up |
07/2007 |
Cut At |
EMR (Kingsbury) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
20/11/1963 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
11/10/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
11/10/1969 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/11/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
11/10/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
by 06/1977 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/11/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6908 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Landore (87E) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
31/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
12/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37208 |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
1985 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37803 |
|
|
01/10/2000 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37803 |
|
|
07/2007 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by EMR: Kingsbury |
|
|