Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 112 Today
» 950 Yesterday
» 112 Week
» 7296 Month
» 315277 Year
» 1199658 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 6909 m/e 11/1940

Names Carried
Date From Name
11/1940 FREWIN HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Hall
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 11/1940
Withdrawal During 06/1964
Scrapping During 12/1964 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 23 yrs , 7 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SPM St Philips Marsh 4w/e 07/09/1946
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 30/04/1951
87B Duffryn Yard 4w/e 01/11/1952
87J Fishguard Goodwick 4w/e 29/11/1952
87F Llanelly 4w/e 06/10/1956
87H Neyland 4w/e 18/06/1960
86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 13/08/1960
88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 08/09/1962
81E Didcot 4w/e 03/11/1962
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 82C Swindon 4w/e 25/03/1950
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction m/e 30/04/1951
ALLOC 87B Duffryn Yard 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 87J Fishguard Goodwick 4w/e 29/11/1952
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 06/10/1956
ALLOC 87H Neyland 4w/e 18/06/1960
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 13/08/1960
ALLOC 88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 08/09/1962
ALLOC 81E Didcot 4w/e 03/11/1962
WDN   w/e 29/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1940 To Service To service as GWR Number 6909, name: FREWIN HALL
Built at Swindon Works
   
07/09/1946 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (SPM)    
30/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Duffryn Yard (87B)    
29/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Fishguard Goodwick (87J)    
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Neyland (87H)    
13/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
12/11/1961 Sightings Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - "A" shop. SLS 1/1962 Link
08/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88L)    
03/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Didcot (81E)    
06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 6909    
12/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev