Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1294 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14700 Week
» 67716 Month
» 187243 Year
» 3214096 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6914 |
13/01/1964 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37214 |
04/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
13/01/1964 to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
Status |
In Service |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
13/01/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
05/1971 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1980 |
|
Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
13/01/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
05/1971 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
WR ATC, Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 06/1977 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 03/1980 |
vot |
Vacuum brakes, No heat, Extended Fuel Tanks |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/01/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6914 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
20/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
07/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
31/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To North Eastern Region (91N) |
|
|
07/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (56B) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
01/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37214 |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
03/1980 |
Modification |
Modification: Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|