Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 166 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17969 Week
» 70985 Month
» 190512 Year
» 3217365 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6924 |
30/01/1964 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37224 |
05/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/5) |
37680 |
1986 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
30/01/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
10/10/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
09/1981 |
|
Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/01/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
10/1970 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
10/10/1970 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/1977 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
09/1981 |
xbt |
Dual brakes, Steam heat, Extended Fuel Tanks |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/01/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6924 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Landore (87E) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
15/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
30/06/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
25/01/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
10/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
14/11/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87A) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37224 |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
09/1981 |
Modification |
Modification: Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|
1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37680 |
|
|