Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 170 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17973 Week
» 70989 Month
» 190516 Year
» 3217369 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6926 |
14/02/1964 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37226 |
05/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/3 (2)) |
37379 |
20/07/1988 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
14/02/1964 to Landore (87E) |
Withdrawn |
01/12/2001 |
Time in Service |
37 yrs, 9 mths , 17 dys |
Cut Up |
01/2008 |
Cut At |
C F Booth (Rotherham) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
14/02/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
25/08/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1974 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/02/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
25/08/1969 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/02/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6926 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Landore (87E) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
15/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
31/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To North Eastern Region (91N) |
|
|
04/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (56B) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
25/08/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37226 |
|
|
12/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Motherwell (ML) |
|
|
20/07/1988 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37379 |
|
|
01/12/2001 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37379 |
|
|
01/2008 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|