Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 289 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18092 Week
» 71108 Month
» 190635 Year
» 3217488 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6932 |
20/03/1964 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37232 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
20/03/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/1970 |
|
Headlight(s) removed |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
13/03/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/03/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
10/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vbh |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat, Headlight |
|
|
|
13/03/1971 |
xbh |
Dual brakes, Steam heat, Headlight |
|
|
|
by 06/1977 |
xbh |
Dual brakes, Steam heat, Headlight |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/03/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6932 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Landore (87E) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) removed |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
13/03/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37232 |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
03/2000 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by English, Welsh & Scottish Railways: Wigan |
|
|