Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 712 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14118 Week
» 67134 Month
» 186661 Year
» 3213514 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6933 |
01/04/1964 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37233 |
04/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/7) |
37889 |
1985 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
01/04/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 30/10/1970 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
09/01/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
03/1974 |
|
Headlight(s) removed |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
01/04/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vbh |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat, Headlight |
|
|
|
12/1970 |
xbh |
Dual brakes, Steam heat, Headlight |
|
|
|
09/01/1971 |
xbh |
Dual brakes, Steam heat, Headlight |
|
|
|
03/1974 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/1977 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/04/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6933 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Landore (87E) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
09/01/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) removed |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37233 |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
1985 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37889 |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
01/06/1999 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37889 |
|
|
03/2007 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Crewe DMD |
|
|