Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1868 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15274 Week
» 68290 Month
» 187817 Year
» 3214670 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6935 |
20/04/1964 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37235 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
20/04/1964 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 03/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 04/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1979 |
|
Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/04/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 12/1979 |
vot |
Vacuum brakes, No heat, Extended Fuel Tanks |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/04/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6935 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Landore (87E) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
20/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
31/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
26/04/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
26/07/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
31/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (55C) |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
28/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37235 |
|
|
10/08/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|
04/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
12/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|
31/03/2008 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37235 |
|
|
30/04/2008 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Carnforth |
|
|