Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 4395 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17801 Week
» 70817 Month
» 190344 Year
» 3217197 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6937 |
13/05/1964 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37237 |
09/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/7) |
37893 |
02/10/1987 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
13/05/1964 to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
Status |
In Service |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
13/05/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/1971 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
|
|
01/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 09/1975 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 09/1975 |
|
Modified headcode box |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
13/05/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
12/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
BR AWS |
|
|
01/1972 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
BR AWS |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/05/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6937 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
27/04/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
29/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
06/02/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
01/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
01/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
25/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
09/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37237 |
|
|
09/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box |
|
|
09/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
02/10/1987 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37893 |
|
|