Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2269 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20072 Week
» 73088 Month
» 192615 Year
» 3219468 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6938 |
12/06/1964 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37238 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
12/06/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 10/1975 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/06/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/06/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6938 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
24/08/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
24/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
14/06/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E) |
|
|
05/07/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
10/07/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (55C) |
|
|
28/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37238 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
26/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
10/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
09/10/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
30/09/2008 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37238 |
|
|
03/2009 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|